Mulaosmanovic, Stephanie Marie (CPSO#: 98029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
WeCHC
Sandwich Community Health Centre
3320 College Avenue
Windsor ON  N9C 0E1
Phone: (519) 258-6002
Fax: (519) 258-7896
Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 May 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE MARIE MULAOSMANOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULAOSMANOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Feb 2015 to 31 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2015