Mulay, Atul Vasant (CPSO#: 76808)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Pune, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2005