Mule, Francesco (CPSO#: 93009)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Jun 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 3777763
Fax: (905) 3736933
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lemon-Mule Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lemon-Mule ( CPSO# 92221 )
Dr. F. Mule ( CPSO# 93009 )

Business Address:
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-4980

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 377-7768

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Francesco  Mule may practise medicine independently in Emergency Medicine,
            only.