Mulgund, Manisha Milind (CPSO#: 87372)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Marathi

Education:University of Mumbai, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
120 San Antonio Drive
Unit 3
Hamilton ON  L9C 5N2
Phone: (905) 574-9999
Fax: (905) 574-8799
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2200 Eglington Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manisha Mulgund Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mulgund ( CPSO# 87372 )

Business Address:
3 - 120 San Antonio Drive
Hamilton ON  L9C 5N2
Phone Number: (905) 574-9999

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 27 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANISHA MILIND MULGUND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULGUND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 04 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2008 to 04 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2009 to 04 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010