Mulla-Ali, Dalal Hamza (CPSO#: 80533)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 16 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Mar 2004 to 16 May 2004
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 May 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010