Mulligan, Anna Marie (CPSO#: 81796)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 May 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Laboratory Medicine Program
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth St.
Toronto
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 4163403072
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Blaise Alexander Clarke and Dr. Anna Marie Mulligan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Clarke ( CPSO# 85366 )
Dr. A. Mulligan ( CPSO# 81796 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
11th Floor Eaton Wing
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3396

Business Address:
University Health Network
Laboratory Medicine Program
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 340-3072

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 12 May 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 20 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 04 May 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 May 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Anna  Marie  Mulligan  may  practise  medicine independently in anatomical
            pathology.