Mullings, Kadir Owen (CPSO#: 93497)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Sep 2010
PEAP - Resident - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 29 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2013 to 31 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016