Mullins, Melanie Elizabeth (CPSO#: 92755)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3001 hospital gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-338-4630
Fax: 905-815-5076
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5359 dundas street west
Etobicoke ON  M9B 1B1
Canada
Phone: (416) 622-3266
Fax: (416) 622-7831
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

720 MacKay St
Pembroke ON  K8A 8J8
Canada
Phone: (613) 735-2358
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Choi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Choi ( CPSO# 89022 )
Dr. M. Mullins ( CPSO# 92755 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatric Surgery
Room 4E
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Corporation Name: Dr. Melanie Mullins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Choi ( CPSO# 89022 )
Dr. M. Mullins ( CPSO# 92755 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
202-5359 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9B 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 622-3266

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE ELIZABETH MULLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012