Mullowney, Tara Lynn (CPSO#: 93093)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Science Centre
Department of Pediatrics
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 58824
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 09 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARA LYNN MULLOWNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLOWNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 07 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2016