Mumtaz, Khalid (CPSO#: 94757)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jan 2011 to 06 Apr 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014