Mundi, Raman (CPSO#: 95218)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Holland Orthopaedic &
Arthritic Centre
43 Wellesley Street East
Room 268
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone: (416) 967-8646
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 31 Dec 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMAN MUNDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2018