Muni, Rajeev Hemant (CPSO#: 77808)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Dept of Ophthalmology & Vision Sci
Suite 801
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7411
Fax: (416) 867-7491
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dept. of Ophthalmology, Sick Kids
555 University Ave.
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-7374
Fax: (416) 813-7040
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1260 Lawrence Ave East
Toronto ON  M3A 1C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 867-7411
Fax: (416) 867-7413
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

kensington eye institute
340 college street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-2132
Fax: (416) 928-6607
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rajeev Muni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Muni ( CPSO# 77808 )
Dr. R. Kohly ( CPSO# 80896 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
801 - 61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7411

Business Address:
Kensington Eye Institute
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-2123

Business Address:
Clearview Eye Institute
1260 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M3A 1C4
Phone Number: (416) 867-7411

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
Eye Clinic
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7374


Corporation Name: Dr. Radha Kohly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Muni ( CPSO# 77808 )
Dr. R. Kohly ( CPSO# 80896 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Opthalmology
2075 Bayview Avenue Suite M1202b
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5607

Business Address:
Kensington Eye Insititute
600 - 340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-2132

Business Address:
212 - 2345 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 2E5
Phone Number: (416) 733-2020

Business Address:
801 Eglinton Avenue West
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Phone Number: (647) 748-8377

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJEEV HEMANT MUNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2007