Muniz Rodriguez, Flor Maria (CPSO#: 76945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Instituto Tecnologico De Santo Domingo, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Regional Rehabilitation Centre
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F. Muniz Rodriguez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Muniz Rodriguez ( CPSO# 76945 )

Business Address:
Regional Rehabilitation Centre
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 07 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FLOR MARIA MUNIZ RODRIGUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNIZ RODRIGUEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 14 Nov 2003
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2016