Munroe, Sarah Anne (CPSO#: 93094)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Emergency Department
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone: 905-623-3331
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Emergency Department
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: 905-576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

2900 Steeles Avenue East
Suite 206
Thornhill ON  L3T 4X1
Canada
Phone: (905) 881-6667
Fax: (905) 731-1298
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Munroe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Munroe ( CPSO# 93094 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Suite 206
Thornhill ON  L3T 4X1
Phone Number: (905) 881-6667

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Emergency Department
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ANNE MUNROE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNROE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2012 to 30 Nov 2012
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2012