Muraca, Maria Franca (CPSO#: 79448)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 701
240 Duncan Mill Road
North York ON  M3B 3S6
Phone: (416) 229-6300
Fax: (416) 229-6283
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M4K 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Muraca Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Muraca ( CPSO# 79448 )

Business Address:
Unit 701
240 Duncan Mill Road
North York ON  M3B 3S6
Phone Number: (416) 229-6300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA FRANCA MURACA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURACA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2005