Muradyan, Heghine S (CPSO#: 92447)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Yerevan State Medical University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Jan 2010 to 18 Apr 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 19 Apr 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010