Murdoch, Jason Edmund Elliott (CPSO#: 76765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Aug 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone: (905) 639-9717
Fax: (905) 639-6132
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 16, 2012
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On February 17, 2012, Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital notified the College that Dr. Jason E. E. Murdoch's privileges are temporarily suspended, effective February 16, 2012.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2003
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 17 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 17 Aug 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 17, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Jason Edmund Elliott
            Murdoch in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Murdoch to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. JASON EDMUND ELLIOTT MURDOCH
                                          ("Dr. Murdoch")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Murdoch, certificate of registration number 76765, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Murdoch, acknowledge that following a College investigation that
                  raised concerns about my standard of practice in family medicine, I
                  underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of my practice. The
                  reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns
                  about my standard of practice in family medicine.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Murdoch, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Professional Education  


                  (a)   I, Dr. Murdoch, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed Individualized Education Plan
                        ("IEP"), attached hereto as Appendix "A", including all of the
                        following professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   Written reviews of the Clinical Practice Guidelines for each
                              of the following, as specified in the IEP: 
                              
                              1.    Hypertension; 
                  
                              2.    Atrial Fibrillation; 
                  
                              3.    Community Acquired Pneumonia; 
                  
                              4.    Neurological Examination of Patients; 
                  
                              5.    Abdominal Pain in the Elderly.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Murdoch, undertake to complete this requirement within four
                        (4) months of signing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Murdoch, acknowledge that the College will determine, in its
                        sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Murdoch, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Locations"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Murdoch, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Murdoch, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Murdoch, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "B". 
                  
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Murdoch, undertake that, approximately three (3) months
                        after the completion of the Professional Education set out in
                        section (5) above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will
                        submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an
                        assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor").  I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Murdoch, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Murdoch, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Murdoch, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Murdoch, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Murdoch, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Murdoch, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Murdoch, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I, Dr. Murdoch, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Murdoch, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Murdoch, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College received information that raised concerns about
                              Dr. Murdoch's standard of practice in family medicine, after
                              which Dr. Murdoch submitted to a reassessment of his
                              practice. As a result of the reassessment:
                  
                                    Dr. Murdoch will engage in professional education in
                                    the assessment and management of patients presenting
                                    with severe hypertension, abdominal pain in the
                                    elderly, community acquired pneumonia, atrial
                                    fibrillation, and the physical examination of patients
                                    presenting with leg weakness.
                  
                                    Dr. Murdoch's practice will be reassessed by an
                                    assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the
                                    end of his completion of the professional education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Murdoch, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Murdoch, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Murdoch, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Murdoch, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff
                  and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the
                  following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (d)   any information which comes to their attention which they
                        reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 17, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Jason Edmund Elliott Murdoch to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 17, 2018:

The College received information that raised concerns about Dr. Murdoch’s standard of practice in family medicine, after which Dr. Murdoch submitted to a reassessment of his practice. As a result of the reassessment:

Dr. Murdoch will engage in professional education in the assessment and management of patients presenting with severe hypertension, abdominal pain in the elderly, community acquired pneumonia, atrial fibrillation, and the physical examination of patients presenting with leg weakness.

Dr. Murdoch’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the end of his completion of the professional education.