Murguia Favela, Luis Enrique (CPSO#: 91543)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 02 Aug 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 03 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015