Murnaghan, Marion Aleisha (CPSO#: 86315)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aleisha Murnaghan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Murnaghan ( CPSO# 86315 )

Business Address:
60 Riverside Drive
Charlottetown PE  C1A 8T5
Phone Number: (902) 894-2111

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARION ALEISHA MURNAGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURNAGHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012