Murphy, Amanda Marie (CPSO#: 93669)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neuroradiology
399 Bathurst Street
McL Wing, 3rd floor
Toronto ON  M5T2S8
Phone: 647-222-7872
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Murphy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Murphy ( CPSO# 93669 )
Dr. B. Murphy ( CPSO# 93325 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street, Donnely Wing
4th Floor, Room 4-072B
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Business Address:
Toronto Western
Division of Neuroradiology
399 Bathurst Street
MCL Wing, 3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (647) 222-7872

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA MARIE MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2015