Murphy, Blake Douglas (CPSO#: 93325)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Donnely Wing, 4th Floor
Room 4-072B
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 3868
Fax: (416) 864-5621
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Murphy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Murphy ( CPSO# 93325 )
Dr. A. Murphy ( CPSO# 93669 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street, Donnely Wing
4th Floor, Room 4-072B
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Business Address:
Toronto Western
Division of Neuroradiology
399 Bathurst Street
MCL Wing, 3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (647) 222-7872

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BLAKE DOUGLAS MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2016