Murphy, Carla Rae (CPSO#: 95342)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
186 Marsh Street
Box 179
Clarksburg ON  N0H 1J0
Phone: (519) 599-5775
Fax: (519) 599-7140
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steedman Murphy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Steedman ( CPSO# 97836 )
Dr. C. Murphy ( CPSO# 95342 )

Business Address:
186 Marsh Street
Box 179
Clarksburg ON  N0H 1J0
Phone Number: (519) 599-5775

Business Address:
CGMH
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W8
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARLA RAE MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2014