Murphy, Colm Joseph (CPSO#: 86145)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 24 May 2007 to 31 May 2007
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 06 Aug 2007
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

McMaster University, 07 Aug 2007 to 09 Aug 2007
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 10 Aug 2007 to 19 Aug 2007
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

McMaster University, 20 Aug 2007 to 22 Aug 2007
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2007