Murphy, Johanna Margaret (CPSO#: 71473)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's University Etherington Hall
Room 1008
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-3131
Fax: (613) 533-6695
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Murphy Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wilson ( CPSO# 72644 )
Dr. J. Murphy ( CPSO# 71473 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Queen's University Etherington Hall
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHANNA MARGARET MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2008