Murphy, John Paul (CPSO#: 64530)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Health Centre Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: 416 284 8131
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health
Ajax Pickering General Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

2880 Ellesmere road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B8
Canada
Phone: 414-284-1697
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 107
601 Harwood Ave South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J5
Canada
Phone: 905-683-8877
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Suite LL4
4040 Finch Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Canada
Phone: 416-292-1505
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 315
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Canada
Phone: 416 287 1222
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: 416 495 2600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Murphy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Murphy ( CPSO# 64530 )

Business Address:
4040 Finch Avenue East
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
LL4
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5

Business Address:
2880 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B8

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Health Centre Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M4Y 2G5
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  M1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN PAUL MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1992