Murphy, Kellie Estelle (CPSO#: 71826)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Wisconsin, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Depart of Obstetrics & Gynecolology
Mount Sinai Hospital
3rd Floor
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-8808 Ext. 1
Fax: (416) 586-3216
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLIE ESTELLE MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1998
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1998