Murphy, Kieran Patrick John (CPSO#: 89502)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Room 3MC - 424
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Kieran Murphy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Murphy ( CPSO# 89502 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Suite 562 5th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
NCSB
1C-546
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Suite 918
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5E 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Third Floor Fell Pavillion
Room 3MC-424
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIERAN PATRICK JOHN MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008