Murphy, Rebekah Jane (CPSO#: 108949)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Elizabeth Bruyere Hospital
Room 284-J
43 Bruyere St.
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: 613-562-6262 Ext. 4007
Fax: 613-562-6371
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBEKAH JANE MURPHY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MURPHY is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. MURPHY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MURPHY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MURPHY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MURPHY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MURPHY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019