Murray, David Wycliffe (CPSO#: 78531)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cambridge, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2006