Murtada Dite Al-Sayed, Sukayna Aly (CPSO#: 84818)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:American University of Beirut, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone: (905) 579-1212
Fax: 289-731-2048
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.A. Murtada Dite Al-Sayed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Murtada Dite Al-Sayed ( CPSO# 84818 )

Business Address:
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Area E
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 579-1212

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Lebanon

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Aug 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUKAYNA ALY MURTADA DITE AL-SAYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTADA DITE AL-SAYED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2008