Murthy, Prashanth (CPSO#: 81581)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 15 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kannada

Education:Bangalore University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Murthy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 29 2014

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 10 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2014