Murthy, Srinivas (CPSO#: 90797)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 2014