Murthy, Trisha Rajini (CPSO#: 84530)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patel & Dr. Murthy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Patel ( CPSO# 90723 )
Dr. T. Murthy ( CPSO# 84530 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 Northshore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 336-4109

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRISHA RAJINI MURTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2010