Murugappan, Siva Subramaniam (CPSO#: 82089)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malay, Tamil

Education:Madras Medical College, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
438 Park Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 1X2
Phone: (519) 397-1577
Fax: (519) 397-5171
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 352-6400 Ext. 6070
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Murugappan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Murugappan ( CPSO# 82089 )

Business Address:
438 Park Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1X2
Phone Number: (519) 354-1200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Feb 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIVA SUBRAMANIAM MURUGAPPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURUGAPPAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2008

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
A civil lawsuit against Dr. Siva Subramaniam Murugappan relating to his medical practice was commenced on June 13, 2014 at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice, London, and was settled on June 19, 2018.