Musa, Ihsan Mohammed (CPSO#: 91931)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch St
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ihsan Musa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Musa ( CPSO# 91931 )

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 12 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IHSAN MOHAMMED MUSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2009