Musa, Waiswa Kasadhakawo (CPSO#: 86060)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Mbarara University of Science & Technolo, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 12 Mar 2009 to 03 Jun 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 04 Jun 2009 to 07 Jan 2010
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jan 2010