Muscat, Anne Helene Cole (CPSO#: 91085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HealthPark Medical Clinics
370 Bayview Drive
Suite 200
Barrie ON  L4N 7L3
Phone: 705-315-2801
Fax: 705-722-7933
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne Muscat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Muscat ( CPSO# 91085 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
370 Bayview Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 7L3
Phone Number: (705) 315-2801

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE HELENE COLE MUSCAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSCAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2011