Mustafa, Abdalhakim Imohd (CPSO#: 69458)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Walkerville Medical Centre
Suite 200
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone: (519) 256-4498
Fax: (519) 256-3270
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdalhakim Mustafa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 15 2011


Corporation Name: Abdalhakim Mustafa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDALHAKIM IMOHD MUSTAFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSTAFA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 May 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2004