Mustafa, Hassan A (CPSO#: 76894)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of General Internal Med
PO Box 209
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L8
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 77137
Fax: (613) 737-8688
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Mustafa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mustafa ( CPSO# 76894 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of General Internal Med
PO Box 209
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L8
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Jul 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HASSAN A MUSTAFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSTAFA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 29 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2002 to 29 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2003 to 29 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2004 to 29 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2005 to 29 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2007 to 28 Feb 2008
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2008