Myers, Leslie Ann (CPSO#: 75659)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Case Western Reserve University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
Box 1800
8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leslie Myers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Myers ( CPSO# 75659 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Box 1800
8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE ANN MYERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2000
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jan 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2002