Mylonas, Ilias (CPSO#: 90386)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 May 2009 to 01 Jun 2009
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 09 Mar 2010 to 05 Apr 2010
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 12 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2012