Myran, Daniel Thomas Josefowitz (CPSO#: 106880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Center Town Community Health Center
420 Cooper Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 2N6
Phone: (613) 233-4443
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL THOMAS JOSEFOWITZ MYRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 08 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 08 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Feb 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 08 Mar 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Mar 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2017