Curpen, Navamanee Belinda (CPSO#: 78380)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Center
Room M6 260
Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 2363
Fax: (416) 480-5266
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Belinda Curpen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M6-260
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4336


Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )
Dr. A. Arenson ( CPSO# 32995 )
Dr. P. Glanc ( CPSO# 55972 )
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )
Dr. C. Betel ( CPSO# 73485 )
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )
Dr. L. Probyn ( CPSO# 73373 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )
Dr. M. Skarpathiotakis ( CPSO# 84703 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )
Dr. S. Symons ( CPSO# 69225 )
Dr. A. Moody ( CPSO# 63017 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. J. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 29908 )
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )
Dr. C. Heyn ( CPSO# 88810 )
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )
Dr. P. Jabehdar Maralani ( CPSO# 84825 )
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. F. Berger ( CPSO# 110670)
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAVAMANEE BELINDA CURPEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURPEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2002