N Kalimuthu, Sangeetha (CPSO#: 107243)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2025

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5319
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Laboratory Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2025

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Sangeetha N Kalimuthu may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Laboratory  Medicine  and  Pathobiology,  University of Toronto, in
                        which Dr. N Kalimuthu holds an academic appointment  at the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires seven  years  from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. N Kalimuthu no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives  a  report  indicating  that Dr. N Kalimuthu's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not receive an annual report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee makes  a  decision  about  Dr.  N  Kalimuthu's
                        certificate   of   registration,  following  consideration  of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  July  1,  2018.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above,  this  certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2025.