Nabata, Elaine Setsuko (CPSO#: 33360)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nabata Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 19 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services Tel: 1-(888) 563-3732
Date Received: 15 May 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018