Nabavi Nouri, Maryam (CPSO#: 95659)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Neurology centre of Toronto
491 Eglinton Avenue West, Suite 100
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: 416 860 7554
Fax: 416 860 7559
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARYAM NABAVI NOURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NABAVI NOURI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2018 to 04 Sep 2018
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2016