Nachim, Ilan (CPSO#: 93474)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7335 Yonge St.
Thornhill ON  L3T 2B2
Phone: (905) 707-7309
Fax: (888) 979-6305
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

14872 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1N2
Canada
Phone: (905) 841-8790
Fax: (905) 841-8978
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

1261 Kennedy Rd.
Unit B2
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L4
Canada
Phone: (416) 490-0499
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

100 Stokes Street
Bell Gateway Building
CAMH
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Canada
Phone: 416-583-4685
Fax: 416-595-6821
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 209
1136 Centre Street Suite
Vaughan ON  L4J 3M8
Canada
Phone: 905-597-5744
Fax: 289-695-0059
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

25 William Graham Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 3G3
Canada
Phone: 905-841-8790
Fax: 905-841-8978
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ilan Nachim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Nachim ( CPSO# 93474 )

Business Address:
25 William Graham Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 3G3

Business Address:
B2 - 1261 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L4
Phone Number: (416) 490-0499

Business Address:
7335 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 1P9
Phone Number: (905) 707-7309

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bellwood Health Services Inc. Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ILAN NACHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NACHIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012