Nacson, Deborah (CPSO#: 77830)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Krieger, Deborah (used until: 03 Oct 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
555 Finch Avenue West, 2 North
North York ON  M2R 1N5
Phone: (416) 633-9420 Ext. 6036
Fax: (416) 632-8718
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deborah Nacson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nacson ( CPSO# 77830 )

Business Address:
Room 2 North
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N6
Phone Number: (416) 633-9420

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH NACSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NACSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008