Nada, Ossama Tarek Sayed (CPSO#: 94071)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ain Shams University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 31 Oct 2012
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2013