Nadarajah, Surabi R (CPSO#: 96370)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:All Saints University (Dominica), 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Hospital
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 15 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SURABI R NADARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADARAJAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 29 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 29 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

McMaster University, 29 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2018